MO HB2336 | 2018 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on April 19 2018 - 50% progression
Action: 2018-04-30 - Second read and referred: Senate Judiciary and Civil and Criminal Jurisprudence(S)
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]

Summary

Prohibits children from being placed in the custody of individuals who have been found guilty of the offense of sexual trafficking of a child in the first degree

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Prohibits children from being placed in the custody of individuals who have been found guilty of the offense of sexual trafficking of a child in the first degree

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2018-04-19 - House - House: HB 2336 HBs 3rd READ - INFORMAL (Y: 144 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 13) [PASS]
2018-04-09 - House - House: HB 2336 (*HA 1 HA 1) HBs PERFECTION - INFORMAL (Y: 22 N: 107 NV: 0 Abs: 32) [FAIL]

History

DateChamberAction
2018-04-30SenateSecond read and referred: Senate Judiciary and Civil and Criminal Jurisprudence(S)
2018-04-19HouseReported to the Senate and First Read (S)
2018-04-19HouseThird Read and Passed (H) - AYES: 144 NOES: 4 PRESENT: 0
2018-04-19HouseTaken Up
2018-04-19HouseReported Do Pass (H) - AYES: 11 NOES: 0 PRESENT: 0
2018-04-19HouseVoted Do Pass (H)
2018-04-19HouseExecutive Session Completed (H)
2018-04-17HousePlaced on Informal Calendar
2018-04-17HouseAction Postponed (H)
2018-04-17HouseExecutive Session Continued
2018-04-10HouseReferred: Fiscal Review(H)
2018-04-09HousePerfected with Amendments (H) - HA 1 adopted
2018-04-09HouseTitle of Bill - Agreed To - relating to criminal offenses
2018-04-09HouseTaken Up for Perfection (H)
2018-04-04HousePlaced on Informal Calendar
2018-03-12HouseReported Do Pass (H) - AYES: 12 NOES: 0 PRESENT: 0
2018-03-12HouseVoted Do Pass (H)
2018-03-12HouseExecutive Session Completed (H)
2018-03-06HouseReferred: Rules - Legislative Oversight(H)
2018-03-06HouseReported Do Pass (H) - AYES: 7 NOES: 0 PRESENT: 0
2018-03-06HouseVoted Do Pass (H)
2018-03-06HouseExecutive Session Completed (H)
2018-02-27HousePublic Hearing Completed (H)
2018-02-07HouseReferred: Crime Prevention and Public Safety(H)
2018-02-01HouseRead Second Time (H)
2018-01-31HouseIntroduced and Read First Time (H)

Missouri State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback