MO HB2335 | 2018 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 31 2018 - 25% progression
Action: 2018-05-17 - Dropped from Calendar - Pursuant to House Rules (H)
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]

Summary

Modifies provisions relating to school employee retirement systems

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Modifies provisions relating to school employee retirement systems

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2018-05-17HouseDropped from Calendar - Pursuant to House Rules (H)
2018-05-02HousePlaced on Informal Calendar
2018-04-05HouseReported Do Pass (H) - AYES: 14 NOES: 0 PRESENT: 0
2018-04-04HouseVoted Do Pass (H)
2018-04-04HouseExecutive Session Completed (H)
2018-02-27HouseReferred: Rules - Administrative Oversight(H)
2018-02-27HouseHCS Reported Do Pass (H) - AYES: 11 NOES: 1 PRESENT: 0
2018-02-26HouseHCS Voted Do Pass (H)
2018-02-26HouseExecutive Session Completed (H)
2018-02-19HousePublic Hearing Completed (H)
2018-02-13HouseReferred: Pensions(H)
2018-02-01HouseRead Second Time (H)
2018-01-31HouseIntroduced and Read First Time (H)

Missouri State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback