MO HB2331 | 2018 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 31 2018 - 25% progression
Action: 2018-04-25 - Public Hearing Completed (H)
Pending: House Professional Registration And Licensing Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

Allows roofing contractors to take an examination testing the individual's knowledge of general roofing practices

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Allows roofing contractors to take an examination testing the individual's knowledge of general roofing practices

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2018-04-25HousePublic Hearing Completed (H)
2018-03-15HouseReferred: Professional Registration and Licensing(H)
2018-02-01HouseRead Second Time (H)
2018-01-31HouseIntroduced and Read First Time (H)

Missouri State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback