MO HB2330 | 2018 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on June 1 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-06-01 - Delivered to Secretary of State (G)
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on June 1 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-06-01 - Delivered to Secretary of State (G)
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Designates a portion of State Highway 30 in St. Louis County as the "Officer Blake Snyder Memorial Highway"
Title
Designates a portion of State Highway 30 in St. Louis County as the "Officer Blake Snyder Memorial Highway"
Sponsors
Sen. Doug Beck [D] |
Roll Calls
2018-05-08 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2018-03-13 - House - House: HB 2330 HBs 3rd READING - CONSENT (Y: 95 N: 37 NV: 0 Abs: 30) [PASS]
2018-03-13 - House - House: HB 2330 HBs 3rd READING - CONSENT (Y: 145 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 16) [PASS]
2018-03-13 - House - House: HB 2330 HBs 3rd READING - CONSENT (Y: 95 N: 37 NV: 0 Abs: 30) [PASS]
2018-03-13 - House - House: HB 2330 HBs 3rd READING - CONSENT (Y: 145 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 16) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-06-01 | Senate | Delivered to Secretary of State (G) |
2018-06-01 | Senate | Approved by Governor (G) |
2018-05-30 | Senate | Delivered to Governor |
2018-05-30 | Senate | Signed by President Pro Tem (S) |
2018-05-30 | Senate | Signed by House Speaker(H) |
2018-05-08 | Senate | Senate Message (S) |
2018-05-08 | Senate | Truly Agreed To and Finally Passed - AYES: 31 NOES: 0 PRESENT: 0 |
2018-05-08 | Senate | Taken Up |
2018-05-08 | Senate | Placed on Informal Calendar |
2018-04-30 | Senate | Reported Do Pass (S) |
2018-04-17 | Senate | Returned to Committee of Origin (S) - Transportation, infrastructure, and Public Safety |
2018-04-17 | Senate | Removed from Consent Calendar (S) |
2018-04-11 | Senate | Reported Do Pass-Placed on Third Read Consent Calendar (S) |
2018-04-11 | Senate | Executive Session Held (S) |
2018-04-10 | Senate | Executive Session Scheduled - Wednesday, April 11, 2018, 12:50pm, Bingham Conference Room |
2018-04-05 | Senate | Public Hearing Held (S) |
2018-04-03 | Senate | Public Hearing Scheduled (S) - Thursday, April 5, 2018, 8:15am, Senate Lounge |
2018-03-29 | Senate | Second read and referred: Senate Transportation, Infrastructure, and Public Safety(S) |
2018-03-13 | House | Reported to the Senate and First Read (S) |
2018-03-13 | House | Third Read and Passed (H) - AYES: 145 NOES: 0 PRESENT: 1 |
2018-03-13 | House | Taken Up |
2018-03-07 | House | Perfected by Consent - Pursuant to House Rules (H) |
2018-02-27 | House | Reported Do Pass - Consent (H) - AYES: 11 NOES: 0 PRESENT: 0 |
2018-02-27 | House | Voted Do Pass - Consent (H) |
2018-02-27 | House | Executive Session Completed (H) |
2018-02-21 | House | Referred: Consent and House Procedure(H) |
2018-02-21 | House | Reported Do Pass - Consent (H) - AYES: 11 NOES: 0 PRESENT: 0 |
2018-02-21 | House | Voted Do Pass - Consent (H) |
2018-02-21 | House | Executive Session Completed (H) |
2018-02-21 | House | Public Hearing Completed (H) |
2018-02-07 | House | Referred: Transportation(H) |
2018-02-01 | House | Read Second Time (H) |
2018-01-31 | House | Introduced and Read First Time (H) |