MO HB233 | 2021 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 6 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-03-01 - Public Hearing Scheduled, Bill not Heard (H)
Pending: House Higher Education Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 6 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-03-01 - Public Hearing Scheduled, Bill not Heard (H)
Pending: House Higher Education Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Establishes the "Informed Student Document Act" to require institutions of higher education to provide outcomes information to incoming freshmen
Title
Establishes the "Informed Student Document Act" to require institutions of higher education to provide outcomes information to incoming freshmen
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-03-01 | House | Public Hearing Scheduled, Bill not Heard (H) |
2021-02-01 | House | Public Hearing Scheduled, Bill not Heard (H) |
2021-01-14 | House | Referred: Higher Education(H) |
2021-01-07 | House | Read Second Time (H) |
2021-01-06 | House | Read First Time (H) |
2020-12-01 | House | Prefiled (H) |