MO HB232 | 2015 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 7 2015 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2015-03-12 - Returned to Committee of Origin (H)
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

Allows home school students to participate in Missouri State High School Activities Association activities for the public school district in which they reside

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Allows home school students to participate in Missouri State High School Activities Association activities for the public school district in which they reside

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2015-03-12HouseReturned to Committee of Origin (H)
2015-03-12HouseExecutive Session Completed (H)
2015-03-03HouseReferred: Select Committee on Education(H)
2015-03-03HouseReported Do Pass with Amendments (H) - HCA 1 AYES: 9 NOES: 3 PRESENT: 0
2015-03-02HouseVoted Do Pass with Amendments (H)
2015-03-02HouseExecutive Session Completed (H)
2015-02-19HousePublic Hearing Completed (H)
2015-01-20HouseReferred: Elementary and Secondary Education(H)
2015-01-08HouseRead Second Time (H)
2015-01-07HouseRead First Time (H)
2014-12-15HousePrefiled (H)

Missouri State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback