MO HB2317 | 2024 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 8 2024 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2024-05-16 - Dropped from Calendar - Pursuant to House Rules (H)
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 8 2024 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2024-05-16 - Dropped from Calendar - Pursuant to House Rules (H)
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Summary
Requires used motor vehicles to be inspected prior to any sale
Title
Requires used motor vehicles to be inspected prior to any sale
Sponsors
Rep. Jeff Knight [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-05-16 | House | Dropped from Calendar - Pursuant to House Rules (H) |
2024-05-01 | House | Placed on the Informal Perfection Calendar (H) |
2024-04-29 | House | Reported Do Pass (H) - AYES: 9 NOES: 0 PRESENT: 0 |
2024-04-29 | House | Voted Do Pass (H) |
2024-04-29 | House | Executive Session Completed (H) |
2024-04-25 | House | Referred: Rules - Legislative Oversight(H) |
2024-04-24 | House | HCS Reported Do Pass (H) - AYES: 15 NOES: 0 PRESENT: 0 |
2024-04-09 | House | HCS Voted Do Pass (H) |
2024-04-09 | House | Executive Session Completed (H) |
2024-04-03 | House | Public Hearing Completed (H) |
2024-02-29 | House | Referred: Special Committee on Government Accountability(H) |
2024-01-09 | House | Read Second Time (H) |
2024-01-08 | House | Introduced and Read First Time (H) |