MO HB231 | 2021 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 6 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-03-04 - Referred: Crime Prevention(H)
Pending: House Crime Prevention Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 6 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-03-04 - Referred: Crime Prevention(H)
Pending: House Crime Prevention Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Modifies the penalties for the offense of animal abuse
Title
Modifies the penalties for the offense of animal abuse
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-03-04 | House | Referred: Crime Prevention(H) |
2021-01-07 | House | Read Second Time (H) |
2021-01-06 | House | Read First Time (H) |
2020-12-01 | House | Prefiled (H) |