MO HB231 | 2019 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 9 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-05-10 - Dropped from Calendar - Pursuant to House Rules (H) - May 9, 2019
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 9 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-05-10 - Dropped from Calendar - Pursuant to House Rules (H) - May 9, 2019
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Modifies provisions of civil procedure regarding joinder and venue.
Title
Modifies provisions of civil procedure regarding joinder and venue.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-05-10 | House | Dropped from Calendar - Pursuant to House Rules (H) - May 9, 2019 |
2019-04-23 | House | Placed on the Informal Perfection Calendar (H) |
2019-04-17 | House | Placed Back on Formal Perfection Calendar |
2019-04-02 | House | Placed on the Informal Perfection Calendar (H) |
2019-03-25 | House | Placed Back on Formal Perfection Calendar |
2019-03-12 | House | Placed on the Informal Perfection Calendar (H) |
2019-02-25 | House | Reported Do Pass (H) - AYES: 6 NOES: 1 PRESENT: 0 |
2019-02-25 | House | Voted Do Pass (H) |
2019-02-25 | House | Executive Session Completed (H) |
2019-02-20 | House | Referred: Rules - Administrative Oversight(H) |
2019-02-20 | House | Reported Do Pass (H) - AYES: 12 NOES: 5 PRESENT: 0 |
2019-02-19 | House | Voted Do Pass (H) |
2019-02-19 | House | Executive Session Completed (H) |
2019-02-12 | House | Public Hearing Completed (H) |
2019-01-23 | House | Referred: Judiciary(H) |
2019-01-10 | House | Read Second Time (H) |
2019-01-09 | House | Read First Time (H) |
2018-12-12 | House | Prefiled (H) |
Missouri State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.house.mo.gov/Bill.aspx?bill=HB231&year=2019&code=R |
Text | https://www.house.mo.gov/billtracking/bills191/hlrbillspdf/0904H.01I.pdf |