MO HB2307 | 2018 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 29 2018 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-02-28 - Public Hearing Completed (H)
Pending: House Transportation Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 29 2018 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-02-28 - Public Hearing Completed (H)
Pending: House Transportation Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Exempts certain motor vehicles used to transport farm products from motor vehicle inspection requirements
Title
Exempts certain motor vehicles used to transport farm products from motor vehicle inspection requirements
Sponsors
Rep. Noel Shull [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-02-28 | House | Public Hearing Completed (H) |
2018-02-21 | House | Referred: Transportation(H) |
2018-01-30 | House | Read Second Time (H) |
2018-01-29 | House | Introduced and Read First Time (H) |
Missouri State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.house.mo.gov/Bill.aspx?bill=HB2307&year=2018&code=R |
Text | https://www.house.mo.gov/billtracking/bills181/hlrbillspdf/5180H.01I.pdf |