MO HB2302 | 2018 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 29 2018 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-04-25 - Voted Do Pass (H)
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]

Summary

Establishes Blair's Law which specifies that a person commits the crime of unlawful use of a weapon if she or she discharges a firearm within or into the limits of a municipality with criminal negligence

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Establishes Blair's Law which specifies that a person commits the crime of unlawful use of a weapon if she or she discharges a firearm within or into the limits of a municipality with criminal negligence

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2018-04-25HouseVoted Do Pass (H)
2018-04-25HouseExecutive Session Completed (H)
2018-04-17HouseReferred: Rules - Legislative Oversight(H)
2018-04-17HouseHCS Reported Do Pass (H) - AYES: 11 NOES: 0 PRESENT: 0
2018-04-09HouseHCS Voted Do Pass (H)
2018-04-09HouseExecutive Session Completed (H)
2018-03-27HousePublic Hearing Completed (H)
2018-02-21HouseReferred: General Laws(H)
2018-01-30HouseRead Second Time (H)
2018-01-29HouseIntroduced and Read First Time (H)

Missouri State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback