MO HB229 | 2019 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on April 8 2019 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-04-30 - SCS Reported Do Pass (S)
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on April 8 2019 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-04-30 - SCS Reported Do Pass (S)
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Summary
Establishes a rebuttable presumption that child custody arrangements that award equal parenting time are in the best interest of the child.
Title
Establishes a rebuttable presumption that child custody arrangements that award equal parenting time are in the best interest of the child.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-04-08 - House - House: HB 229 HBs FOR THIRD READING (Y: 103 N: 46 NV: 0 Abs: 12) [PASS]
2019-04-08 - House - House: HB 229 HBs FOR THIRD READING (Y: 119 N: 30 NV: 1 Abs: 11) [PASS]
2019-04-08 - House - House: HB 229 HBs FOR THIRD READING (Y: 119 N: 30 NV: 1 Abs: 11) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-04-30 | Senate | SCS Reported Do Pass (S) |
2019-04-25 | Senate | SCS Voted Do Pass (S) |
2019-04-25 | Senate | Executive Session Held (S) |
2019-04-17 | Senate | Public Hearing Held (S) |
2019-04-12 | Senate | Public Hearing Scheduled (S) - Wednesday, April 17, 2019, 8 a.m., Senate Lounge |
2019-04-09 | Senate | Second read and referred: Seniors, Families and Children(S) |
2019-04-08 | House | Reported to the Senate and First Read (S) |
2019-04-08 | House | Third Read and Passed (H) - AYES: 119 NOES: 30 PRESENT: 1 |
2019-04-08 | House | Taken Up |
2019-04-03 | House | Perfected with Amendments (H) - HA 1 adopted |
2019-04-03 | House | HCS Adopted (H) |
2019-04-03 | House | Title of Bill - Agreed To |
2019-04-03 | House | Taken Up |
2019-04-03 | House | Placed Back on Formal Perfection Calendar |
2019-04-02 | House | Placed on the Informal Perfection Calendar (H) |
2019-03-07 | House | Reported Do Pass (H) - AYES: 5 NOES: 3 PRESENT: 0 |
2019-03-07 | House | Voted Do Pass (H) |
2019-03-07 | House | Executive Session Completed (H) |
2019-02-27 | House | Referred: Rules - Administrative Oversight(H) |
2019-02-27 | House | HCS Reported Do Pass (H) - AYES: 13 NOES: 3 PRESENT: 0 |
2019-02-26 | House | HCS Voted Do Pass (H) |
2019-02-26 | House | Executive Session Completed (H) |
2019-02-19 | House | Public Hearing Completed (H) |
2019-01-16 | House | Referred: Judiciary(H) |
2019-01-10 | House | Read Second Time (H) |
2019-01-09 | House | Read First Time (H) |
2018-12-11 | House | Prefiled (H) |