MO HB2287 | 2018 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 25 2018 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-05-01 - Referred: Rules - Administrative Oversight(H)
Pending: House Rules - Administrative Oversight Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 25 2018 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-05-01 - Referred: Rules - Administrative Oversight(H)
Pending: House Rules - Administrative Oversight Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Summary
Requires automatic driver's license revocation when a driver strikes a highway worker in a construction or work zone
Title
Requires automatic driver's license revocation when a driver strikes a highway worker in a construction or work zone
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-05-01 | House | Referred: Rules - Administrative Oversight(H) |
2018-05-01 | House | HCS Reported Do Pass (H) - AYES: 7 NOES: 1 PRESENT: 0 |
2018-04-30 | House | HCS Voted Do Pass (H) |
2018-04-30 | House | Executive Session Completed (H) |
2018-02-28 | House | Action Postponed (H) |
2018-02-28 | House | Executive Session Continued |
2018-02-14 | House | Public Hearing Completed (H) |
2018-01-31 | House | Referred: Transportation(H) |
2018-01-29 | House | Read Second Time (H) |
2018-01-25 | House | Introduced and Read First Time (H) |