MO HB2277 | 2018 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 15 2018 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-05-14 - Placed on Informal Calendar
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]

Summary

Exempts permanently disabled persons from the requirement that a physician's statement be provided each time a disabled license plate or windshield placard is renewed.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Exempts permanently disabled persons from the requirement that a physician's statement be provided each time a disabled license plate or windshield placard is renewed.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2018-03-15 - House - House: HB 2277 HBs FOR THIRD READING (Y: 138 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 23) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2018-05-14SenatePlaced on Informal Calendar
2018-05-11SenateReported Do Pass (S)
2018-05-11SenateExecutive Session Held (S) - Voted do pass
2018-05-09SenateExecutive Session Scheduled - Friday, May 11, 2018, 9:00am, Bingham Conference Room
2018-05-09SenateReferred: Senate Fiscal Oversight(S)
2018-05-07SenateSCS Reported Do Pass (S)
2018-04-26SenateExecutive Session Held (S) - SCS voted do pass
2018-04-12SenatePublic Hearing Held (S)
2018-04-10SenatePublic Hearing Scheduled (S) - Thursday, April 12, 2018, 8:15am, Senate Lounge
2018-03-29SenateSecond read and referred: Senate Transportation, Infrastructure, and Public Safety(S)
2018-03-15HouseReported to the Senate and First Read (S)
2018-03-15HouseThird Read and Passed (H) - AYES: 138 NOES: 1 PRESENT: 0
2018-03-15HouseTaken Up
2018-03-12HousePerfected with Amendments (H) - HA 1 adopted
2018-03-12HouseHCS Adopted (H)
2018-03-12HouseTitle of Bill - Agreed To
2018-03-12HouseTaken Up for Perfection (H)
2018-03-06HouseReported Do Pass (H) - AYES: 13 NOES: 0 PRESENT: 0
2018-03-05HouseVoted Do Pass (H)
2018-03-05HouseExecutive Session Completed (H)
2018-02-21HouseReferred: Rules - Administrative Oversight(H)
2018-02-21HouseHCS Reported Do Pass (H) - AYES: 11 NOES: 0 PRESENT: 0
2018-02-21HouseHCS Voted Do Pass (H)
2018-02-21HouseExecutive Session Completed (H)
2018-02-14HousePublic Hearing Completed (H)
2018-01-31HouseReferred: Transportation(H)
2018-01-29HouseRead Second Time (H)
2018-01-25HouseIntroduced and Read First Time (H)

Missouri State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback