MO HB2276 | 2018 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 25 2018 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-04-25 - Reported Do Pass (H) - AYES: 10 NOES: 0 PRESENT: 0
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 25 2018 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-04-25 - Reported Do Pass (H) - AYES: 10 NOES: 0 PRESENT: 0
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Summary
Modifies the offense of unlawful possession of a firearm
Title
Modifies the offense of unlawful possession of a firearm
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-04-25 | House | Reported Do Pass (H) - AYES: 10 NOES: 0 PRESENT: 0 |
2018-04-11 | House | Voted Do Pass (H) |
2018-04-11 | House | Executive Session Completed (H) |
2018-03-15 | House | Referred: Rules - Legislative Oversight(H) |
2018-03-15 | House | HCS Reported Do Pass (H) - AYES: 12 NOES: 0 PRESENT: 0 |
2018-03-13 | House | HCS Voted Do Pass (H) |
2018-03-13 | House | Executive Session Completed (H) |
2018-03-06 | House | Action Postponed (H) |
2018-03-06 | House | Executive Session Continued |
2018-02-27 | House | Public Hearing Completed (H) |
2018-02-13 | House | Referred: General Laws(H) |
2018-01-29 | House | Read Second Time (H) |
2018-01-25 | House | Introduced and Read First Time (H) |