MO HB2259 | 2020 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 22 2020 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-04-27 - Reported Do Pass (H) - AYES: 7 NOES: 0 PRESENT: 0
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 22 2020 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-04-27 - Reported Do Pass (H) - AYES: 7 NOES: 0 PRESENT: 0
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Allows military members to renew concealed carry permits by mail while on active duty.
Title
Allows military members to renew concealed carry permits by mail while on active duty.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-04-27 | House | Reported Do Pass (H) - AYES: 7 NOES: 0 PRESENT: 0 |
2020-03-05 | House | Voted Do Pass (H) |
2020-03-05 | House | Executive Session Completed (H) |
2020-02-13 | House | Referred: Rules - Administrative Oversight(H) |
2020-02-13 | House | Reported Do Pass (H) - AYES: 15 NOES: 0 PRESENT: 0 |
2020-02-12 | House | Voted Do Pass (H) |
2020-02-12 | House | Executive Session Completed (H) |
2020-02-05 | House | Public Hearing Completed (H) |
2020-01-30 | House | Referred: Veterans(H) |
2020-01-23 | House | Read Second Time (H) |
2020-01-22 | House | Introduced and Read First Time (H) |
Missouri State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.house.mo.gov/Bill.aspx?bill=HB2259&year=2020&code=R |
Text | https://www.house.mo.gov/billtracking/bills201/hlrbillspdf/4979H.01I.pdf |