MO HB2259 | 2020 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 22 2020 - 25% progression
Action: 2020-04-27 - Reported Do Pass (H) - AYES: 7 NOES: 0 PRESENT: 0
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

Allows military members to renew concealed carry permits by mail while on active duty

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Allows military members to renew concealed carry permits by mail while on active duty

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2020-04-27HouseReported Do Pass (H) - AYES: 7 NOES: 0 PRESENT: 0
2020-03-05HouseVoted Do Pass (H)
2020-03-05HouseExecutive Session Completed (H)
2020-02-13HouseReferred: Rules - Administrative Oversight(H)
2020-02-13HouseReported Do Pass (H) - AYES: 15 NOES: 0 PRESENT: 0
2020-02-12HouseVoted Do Pass (H)
2020-02-12HouseExecutive Session Completed (H)
2020-02-05HousePublic Hearing Completed (H)
2020-01-30HouseReferred: Veterans(H)
2020-01-23HouseRead Second Time (H)
2020-01-22HouseIntroduced and Read First Time (H)

Missouri State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback