MO HB2257 | 2020 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 22 2020 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-02-13 - HCS Reported Do Pass (H) - AYES: 11 NOES: 0 PRESENT: 0
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 22 2020 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-02-13 - HCS Reported Do Pass (H) - AYES: 11 NOES: 0 PRESENT: 0
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Changes the laws regarding credit unions by simplifying filing requirements.
Title
Changes the laws regarding credit unions by simplifying filing requirements.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-02-13 | House | HCS Reported Do Pass (H) - AYES: 11 NOES: 0 PRESENT: 0 |
2020-02-13 | House | HCS Voted Do Pass (H) |
2020-02-13 | House | Executive Session Completed (H) |
2020-01-30 | House | Public Hearing Completed (H) |
2020-01-28 | House | Referred: Financial Institutions(H) |
2020-01-23 | House | Read Second Time (H) |
2020-01-22 | House | Introduced and Read First Time (H) |
Missouri State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.house.mo.gov/Bill.aspx?bill=HB2257&year=2020&code=R |
Text | https://www.house.mo.gov/billtracking/bills201/hlrbillspdf/4982H.01I.pdf |