MO HB2249 | 2020 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 22 2020 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-05-01 - Placed on the Informal Perfection Calendar (H)
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 22 2020 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-05-01 - Placed on the Informal Perfection Calendar (H)
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Establishes a special license plate for persons who have been awarded a Meritorious Service Medal.
Title
Establishes a special license plate for persons who have been awarded a Meritorious Service Medal.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-05-01 | House | Placed on the Informal Perfection Calendar (H) |
2020-03-18 | House | Placed Back on Formal Perfection Calendar |
2020-03-12 | House | Placed on the Informal Perfection Calendar (H) |
2020-02-27 | House | Reported Do Pass (H) - AYES: 8 NOES: 0 PRESENT: 0 |
2020-02-26 | House | Voted Do Pass (H) |
2020-02-26 | House | Executive Session Completed (H) |
2020-02-13 | House | Referred: Rules - Administrative Oversight(H) |
2020-02-13 | House | Reported Do Pass (H) - AYES: 14 NOES: 0 PRESENT: 0 |
2020-02-13 | House | Voted Do Pass (H) |
2020-02-13 | House | Executive Session Completed (H) |
2020-02-10 | House | Public Hearing Completed (H) |
2020-01-30 | House | Referred: Transportation(H) |
2020-01-23 | House | Read Second Time (H) |
2020-01-22 | House | Introduced and Read First Time (H) |
Missouri State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.house.mo.gov/Bill.aspx?bill=HB2249&year=2020&code=R |
Text | https://www.house.mo.gov/billtracking/bills201/hlrbillspdf/5034H.01I.pdf |