MO HB2238 | 2014 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on July 14 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-07-14 - Delivered to Secretary of State (G)
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]

Summary

Changes the laws regarding hemp and allows the use of hemp extract to treat specified individuals with epilepsy

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Changes the laws regarding hemp and allows the use of hemp extract to treat specified individuals with epilepsy

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2014-07-14HouseDelivered to Secretary of State (G)
2014-07-14HouseApproved by Governor (G)
2014-05-30HouseDelivered to Governor
2014-05-30HouseSigned by President Pro Tem (S)
2014-05-30HouseSigned by House Speaker(H)
2014-05-01HouseHouse Message (H)
2014-05-01HouseEmergency Clause Adopted on Truly Agreed to Bill - AYES: 138 NOES: 9
2014-05-01HouseTruly Agreed To and Finally Passed - AYES: 136 NOES: 12
2014-05-01HouseHouse Adopts (H) - SCS ADOPTED AYES: 137 NOES: 12
2014-05-01HouseTaken Up
2014-05-01SenateReported to the House with... (H) - SCS
2014-05-01SenateEmergency Clause Adopted (S) - AYES: 32
2014-05-01SenateThird Read and Passed (S) - AYES: 32
2014-05-01SenateSCS Adopted (S)
2014-05-01SenateTaken Up for Third Reading (S)
2014-05-01SenateReported Do Pass (S)
2014-05-01SenateExecutive Session Held (S) - Voted do pass
2014-04-30SenateExecutive Session Scheduled - THURSDAY, MAY 1, 2014, 9:45AM, PERSHING CONFERENCE ROOM
2014-04-30SenateReferred: Senate Governmental Accountability and Fiscal Oversight(S)
2014-04-30SenateSCS Reported Do Pass (S)
2014-04-30SenateExecutive Session Held (S) - SCS VOTED DO PASS
2014-04-30SenatePublic Hearing Held (S)
2014-04-29SenateExecutive Session Scheduled - Wednesday, April 30, 2014, 1:45pm, Senate Committee Room 1
2014-04-29SenatePublic Hearing Scheduled (S)
2014-04-29SenateSecond read and referred: Senate Judiciary and Civil and Criminal Jurisprudence(S)
2014-04-28HouseReported to the Senate and First Read (S)
2014-04-24HouseEmergency Clause Adopted (H) - AYES: 136 NOES: 14
2014-04-24HouseThird Read and Passed (H) - AYES: 139 NOES: 13
2014-04-24HouseTaken Up for Third Reading (H)
2014-04-24HouseReported Do Pass (H)
2014-04-24HouseVoted Do Pass (H)
2014-04-24HouseExecutive Session Completed (H)
2014-04-23HouseReferred: Fiscal Review(H)
2014-04-22HousePerfected with Amendments (H) - ha 1 adopted
2014-04-22HouseHCS Adopted (H)
2014-04-22HouseTaken Up for Perfection (H)
2014-04-10HouseRules - Reported Do Pass (H)
2014-04-10HouseRules - Voted Do Pass (H)
2014-04-10HouseRules - Executive Session Completed (H)
2014-04-09HouseReferred: Rules(H)
2014-04-09HouseHCS Reported Do Pass (H)
2014-04-08HouseHCS Voted Do Pass (H)
2014-04-08HouseExecutive Session Completed (H)
2014-04-08HousePublic Hearing Completed (H)
2014-04-01HouseReferred: General Laws(H)
2014-04-01HouseRead Second Time (H)
2014-03-31HouseIntroduced and Read First Time (H)

Missouri State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback