MO HB2208 | 2018 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 15 2018 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-05-14 - Placed on Informal Calendar
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]

Summary

Modifies provisions of law relating to paper ballots

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Modifies provisions of law relating to paper ballots

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2018-03-15 - House - House: HB 2208 HBs FOR THIRD READING (Y: 108 N: 31 NV: 0 Abs: 23) [PASS]
2018-03-12 - House - House: HB 2208 HBs FOR PERFECTION (Y: 85 N: 32 NV: 0 Abs: 45) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2018-05-14SenatePlaced on Informal Calendar
2018-05-09SenateSCS Reported Do Pass (S)
2018-05-08SenateExecutive Session Held (S) - SCS voted do pass
2018-04-24SenatePublic Hearing Held (S)
2018-04-19SenatePublic Hearing Scheduled (S) - Tuesday, April 24, 2018, 12:00pm, Senate Lounge
2018-03-29SenateSecond read and referred: Senate Local Government and Elections(S)
2018-03-15HouseReported to the Senate and First Read (S)
2018-03-15HouseThird Read and Passed (H) - AYES: 108 NOES: 31 PRESENT: 0
2018-03-15HouseTaken Up
2018-03-12HousePerfected with Amendments (H) - HA 1 adopted
2018-03-12HouseTitle of Bill - Agreed To
2018-03-12HouseTaken Up for Perfection (H)
2018-03-06HouseReported Do Pass (H) - AYES: 10 NOES: 2 PRESENT: 0
2018-03-05HouseVoted Do Pass (H)
2018-03-05HouseExecutive Session Completed (H)
2018-02-15HouseReferred: Rules - Administrative Oversight(H)
2018-02-15HouseReported Do Pass (H) - AYES: 5 NOES: 4 PRESENT: 0
2018-02-14HouseVoted Do Pass (H)
2018-02-14HouseExecutive Session Completed (H)
2018-02-07HousePublic Hearing Completed (H)
2018-01-31HouseReferred: Elections and Elected Officials(H)
2018-01-24HouseRead Second Time (H)
2018-01-23HouseIntroduced and Read First Time (H)

Missouri State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback