MO HB220 | 2019 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Enrolled on May 14 2019 - 75% progression
Action: 2019-05-29 - Delivered to Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

Modifies provisions relating to the taxation of property involved in producing wind energy

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Modifies provisions relating to the taxation of property involved in producing wind energy

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-05-14 - House - House: HB 220 HBs WITH SENATE AMENDMENTS (Y: 144 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 14) [PASS]
2019-05-14 - House - House: HB 220 HBs WITH SENATE AMENDMENTS (Y: 141 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 16) [PASS]
2019-05-09 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading (Y: 34 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-07 - House - House: HB 220 HBs FOR THIRD READING (Y: 151 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 9) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-05-29HouseDelivered to Governor
2019-05-29HouseSigned by President Pro Tem (S)
2019-05-29HouseSigned by House Speaker(H)
2019-05-14HouseTruly Agreed To and Finally Passed
2019-05-14HouseHouse Adopts (H) - SS as amended
2019-05-14HouseTaken Up
2019-05-09HouseReported Do Pass (H) - AYES: 9 NOES: 0 PRESENT: 0
2019-05-09HouseVoted Do Pass (H)
2019-05-09HouseExecutive Session Completed (H)
2019-05-09HouseReferred: Fiscal Review(H)
2019-05-09SenateReported to the House with... (H) - SS as amended
2019-05-09SenateThird Read and Passed with Amendments (S) - SA 1
2019-05-09SenateSS Adopted (S)
2019-05-09SenateTaken Up
2019-05-09SenateReported Do Pass (S)
2019-05-09SenateVoted Do Pass (S)
2019-05-09SenateExecutive Session Held (S)
2019-05-08SenateExecutive Session Scheduled - Thursday, May 9, 2019, 9:30am, Bingham Conference Room
2019-05-07SenateReferred: Fiscal Review(H)
2019-05-07SenateSenate Substitute Offered (S)
2019-04-18SenateSCS Reported Do Pass (S)
2019-05-07SenateTaken Up
2019-04-09SenateSCS Voted Do Pass (S)
2019-04-09SenateExecutive Session Held (S)
2019-04-05SenateExecutive Session Scheduled - Tuesday, April 9, 2019, 8:15 a.m., Senate Lounge
2019-04-02SenatePublic Hearing Held (S)
2019-03-28SenatePublic Hearing Scheduled (S) - Tuesday, April 2, 2019, 8:00 a.m., Senate Lounge
2019-03-26SenateSecond read and referred: Ways and Means(S)
2019-03-07HouseReported to the Senate and First Read (S)
2019-03-07HouseThird Read and Passed (H)
2019-03-07HouseTaken Up
2019-03-05HousePerfected with Amendments (H) - HA 1 adopted
2019-03-05HouseHCS Adopted (H)
2019-03-05HouseTitle of Bill - Agreed To
2019-03-05HouseTaken Up
2019-02-26HouseReported Do Pass (H) - AYES: 8 NOES: 0 PRESENT: 0
2019-02-26HouseVoted Do Pass (H)
2019-02-26HouseExecutive Session Completed (H)
2019-02-21HouseReferred: Rules - Legislative Oversight(H)
2019-02-21HouseHCS Reported Do Pass (H) - AYES: 14 NOES: 0 PRESENT: 0
2019-02-19HouseHCS Voted Do Pass (H)
2019-02-19HouseExecutive Session Completed (H)
2019-02-05HousePublic Hearing Completed (H)
2019-01-31HouseReferred: Utilities(H)
2019-01-10HouseRead Second Time (H)
2019-01-09HouseRead First Time (H)
2018-12-10HousePrefiled (H)

Missouri State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttps://www.house.mo.gov/Bill.aspx?bill=HB220&year=2019&code=R
Texthttps://www.house.mo.gov/billtracking/bills191/hlrbillspdf/0313H.01I.pdf
Texthttps://www.house.mo.gov/billtracking/bills191/hlrbillspdf/0313H.03C.pdf
Texthttps://www.house.mo.gov/billtracking/bills191/hlrbillspdf/0313H.03P.pdf
Texthttps://www.house.mo.gov/billtracking/bills191/hlrbillspdf/0313S.05C.pdf
Texthttps://www.house.mo.gov/billtracking/bills191/hlrbillspdf/0313S.09F.pdf
Texthttps://www.house.mo.gov/billtracking/bills191/hlrbillspdf/0313S.09T.pdf
Roll Callhttps://www.house.mo.gov/billtracking/bills191/rollcalls/034.003.pdf
Roll Callhttps://www.senate.mo.gov/19info/Journals/RDay6505091112-1210.pdf#1129
Roll Callhttps://www.house.mo.gov/billtracking/bills191/rollcalls/069.013.pdf
Roll Callhttps://www.house.mo.gov/billtracking/bills191/rollcalls/069.012.pdf

Bill Comments

feedback