MO HB2192 | 2018 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on April 3 2018 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-04-05 - Second read and referred: Senate Education(S)
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on April 3 2018 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-04-05 - Second read and referred: Senate Education(S)
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Modifies the bonding requirement for the treasurer of a seven-director school district
Title
Modifies the bonding requirement for the treasurer of a seven-director school district
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2018-04-03 - House - House: HB 2192 HBs 3rd READING - CONSENT (Y: 148 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 11) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-04-05 | Senate | Second read and referred: Senate Education(S) |
2018-04-03 | House | Reported to the Senate and First Read (S) |
2018-04-03 | House | Third Read and Passed (H) - AYES: 148 NOES: 2 PRESENT: 0 |
2018-04-03 | House | Taken Up |
2018-03-23 | House | Perfected by Consent - Pursuant to House Rules (H) |
2018-03-08 | House | Reported Do Pass - Consent (H) - AYES: 10 NOES: 0 PRESENT: 0 |
2018-03-08 | House | Voted Do Pass - Consent (H) |
2018-03-08 | House | Executive Session Completed (H) |
2018-03-06 | House | Referred: Consent and House Procedure(H) |
2018-03-06 | House | Reported Do Pass - Consent (H) - AYES: 12 NOES: 0 PRESENT: 0 |
2018-03-05 | House | Voted Do Pass - Consent (H) |
2018-03-05 | House | Executive Session Completed (H) |
2018-02-26 | House | Public Hearing Completed (H) |
2018-01-31 | House | Referred: Elementary and Secondary Education(H) |
2018-01-23 | House | Read Second Time (H) |
2018-01-22 | House | Introduced and Read First Time (H) |