MO HB2186 | 2014 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on March 26 2014 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2014-05-01 - Public Hearing Completed (H)
Pending: House General Laws Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on March 26 2014 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2014-05-01 - Public Hearing Completed (H)
Pending: House General Laws Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Requires every health insurer and pharmacy benefit manager to use a single standardized prior authorization request form
Title
Requires every health insurer and pharmacy benefit manager to use a single standardized prior authorization request form
Sponsors
Rep. Caleb Jones [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-05-01 | House | Public Hearing Completed (H) |
2014-04-08 | House | Referred: General Laws(H) |
2014-03-27 | House | Read Second Time (H) |
2014-03-26 | House | Introduced and Read First Time (H) |
Missouri State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.house.mo.gov/billsummary.aspx?bill=HB2186&year=2014&code=R |
Text | https://www.house.mo.gov/billtracking/bills141/biltxt/intro/HB2186I.htm |