MO HB2182 | 2024 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 3 2024 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2024-04-09 - HCS Voted Do Pass (H)
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 3 2024 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2024-04-09 - HCS Voted Do Pass (H)
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Requires the department of health and senior services to develop an educational pamphlet on nonopioid alternatives for the treatment of pain
Title
Requires the department of health and senior services to develop an educational pamphlet on nonopioid alternatives for the treatment of pain
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-04-09 | House | HCS Voted Do Pass (H) |
2024-04-09 | House | Executive Session Completed (H) |
2024-03-26 | House | Public Hearing Completed (H) |
2024-03-14 | House | Referred: Healthcare Reform(H) |
2024-01-04 | House | Read Second Time (H) |
2024-01-03 | House | Introduced and Read First Time (H) |