MO HB2170 | 2020 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 14 2020 - 25% progression
Action: 2020-03-10 - Referred: Rules - Administrative Oversight(H)
Pending: House Rules - Administrative Oversight Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]

Summary

Modifies provisions relating to the Department of Corrections, the Division of Probation and Parole, and the Parole Board

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Modifies provisions relating to the Department of Corrections, the Division of Probation and Parole, and the Parole Board

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2020-03-10HouseReferred: Rules - Administrative Oversight(H)
2020-03-10HouseHCS Reported Do Pass (H) - AYES: 8 NOES: 0 PRESENT: 0
2020-03-10HouseHCS Voted Do Pass (H)
2020-03-10HouseExecutive Session Completed (H)
2020-03-03HousePublic Hearing Completed (H)
2020-02-20HouseReferred: Corrections and Public Institutions(H)
2020-01-15HouseRead Second Time (H)
2020-01-14HouseIntroduced and Read First Time (H)

Missouri State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback