MO HB2168 | 2022 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on June 30 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-06-30 - Delivered to Secretary of State (G)
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on June 30 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-06-30 - Delivered to Secretary of State (G)
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Modifies provisions relating to insurance
Title
Modifies provisions relating to insurance
Sponsors
Rep. Jeff Porter [R] |
Roll Calls
2022-05-11 - House - House: HB 2168 BILLS IN CONFERENCE (Y: 127 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 26) [PASS]
2022-05-11 - House - House: HB 2168 BILLS IN CONFERENCE (Y: 130 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 22) [PASS]
2022-05-04 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2022-03-10 - House - House: HB 2168 HBs 3rd READ - INFORMAL (Y: 134 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 23) [PASS]
2022-05-11 - House - House: HB 2168 BILLS IN CONFERENCE (Y: 130 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 22) [PASS]
2022-05-04 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2022-03-10 - House - House: HB 2168 HBs 3rd READ - INFORMAL (Y: 134 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 23) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-06-30 | House | Delivered to Secretary of State (G) |
2022-06-30 | House | Approved by Governor (G) |
2022-05-18 | House | Delivered to Governor |
2022-05-18 | House | Signed by President Pro Tem (S) |
2022-05-18 | House | Signed by House Speaker (H) |
2022-05-11 | House | Senate Message (S) |
2022-05-11 | House | Truly Agreed To and Finally Passed - AYES: 31 NOES: 0 PRESENT: 0 |
2022-05-11 | House | Senate Adopts Conference Committee Report (S) - AYES: 31 NOES: 0 PRESENT: 0 |
2022-05-11 | House | Senate Submits Conference Committee Report (S) |
2022-05-11 | House | House Message (H) |
2022-05-11 | House | Third Read and Passed (H) - AYES: 130 NOES: 4 PRESENT: 0 |
2022-05-11 | House | House Adopts Conference Committee Report (H) - AYES: 127 NOES: 3 PRESENT: 0 |
2022-05-11 | House | House Submits Conference Committee Report (H) |
2022-05-11 | House | Reported Do Pass (H) - AYES: 6 NOES: 1 PRESENT: 0 |
2022-05-11 | House | Executive Session Completed (H) |
2022-05-11 | House | Voted Do Pass (H) |
2022-05-10 | House | Referred: Fiscal Review(H) |
2022-05-10 | House | House Distributes Conference Committee Report (H) |
2022-05-06 | House | House Message (H) |
2022-05-06 | House | House Conference Committee Appointed (H) - REPRESENTATIVES PORTER, WIEMANN, GRIER, ELLEBRACHT, BUTZ |
2022-05-06 | House | Senate Message (S) |
2022-05-06 | House | Senate Message (S) |
2022-05-05 | House | Senate Conference Committee Appointed (S) - CRAWFORD, WIELAND, ESLINGER, ROBERTS, MOSLEY |
2022-05-05 | House | Senate Refuses to Recede, Grants Conference (S) |
2022-05-05 | House | House Message (H) |
2022-05-05 | House | House Refuses to Adopt, Requests Senate to Recede or Grant Conference (H) |
2022-05-05 | House | Taken Up |
2022-05-05 | House | Reported Do Pass (H) - AYES: 6 NOES: 1 PRESENT: 0 |
2022-05-05 | House | Voted Do Pass (H) |
2022-05-05 | House | Executive Session Completed (H) |
2022-05-05 | House | Referred: Fiscal Review(H) |
2022-05-05 | Senate | Reported to the House with... (H) - SS SCS, as amended |
2022-05-04 | Senate | Third Read and Passed with Amendments (S) - SA 2, adopted AYES: 31 NOES: 1 PRESENT: 0 |
2022-05-04 | Senate | SS Adopted (S) |
2022-05-04 | Senate | SS Offered |
2022-05-04 | Senate | Taken Up for Third Reading (S) |
2022-05-04 | Senate | Reported Do Pass (S) |
2022-05-03 | Senate | Voted Do Pass (S) |
2022-05-03 | Senate | Executive Session Held (S) |
2022-05-02 | Senate | Executive Session Scheduled - Tuesday, May 3, 2022, 11:25 a.m., Senate Committee Room 2. |
2022-05-02 | Senate | Referred: Governmental Accountability and Fiscal Oversight(S) |
2022-04-27 | Senate | SCS Reported Do Pass (S) |
2022-04-26 | Senate | SCS Voted Do Pass (S) |
2022-04-26 | Senate | Executive Session Held (S) |
2022-04-19 | Senate | Public Hearing Held (S) |
2022-04-14 | Senate | Public Hearing Scheduled (S) - Tuesday, April 19, 2022, 3:00 p.m., Senate Lounge. |
2022-03-31 | Senate | Second read and referred: Insurance and Banking(S) |
2022-03-10 | House | Reported to the Senate and First Read (S) |
2022-03-10 | House | Third Read and Passed (H) - AYES: 134 NOES: 0 PRESENT: 0 |
2022-03-10 | House | Taken Up for Third Reading (H) |
2022-03-09 | House | Placed on the Informal Third Reading Calendar (H) |
2022-03-02 | House | Perfected (H) |
2022-03-02 | House | HCS Adopted (H) |
2022-03-02 | House | Title of Bill - Agreed To |
2022-03-02 | House | Taken Up for Perfection (H) |
2022-03-01 | House | Placed on the Informal Perfection Calendar (H) |
2022-02-22 | House | Reported Do Pass (H) - AYES: 10 NOES: 0 PRESENT: 0 |
2022-02-22 | House | Voted Do Pass (H) |
2022-02-22 | House | Executive Session Completed (H) |
2022-02-08 | House | Referred: Rules - Legislative Oversight(H) |
2022-02-08 | House | HCS Reported Do Pass (H) - AYES: 12 NOES: 0 PRESENT: 0 |
2022-02-08 | House | HCS Voted Do Pass (H) |
2022-02-08 | House | Executive Session Completed (H) |
2022-02-01 | House | Public Hearing Completed (H) |
2022-01-27 | House | Referred: Insurance(H) |
2022-01-06 | House | Read Second Time (H) |
2022-01-05 | House | Read First Time (H) |
2022-01-04 | House | Prefiled (H) |