MO HB2142 | 2022 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 5 2022 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-05-09 - Placed on the Informal Perfection Calendar (H)
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 5 2022 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-05-09 - Placed on the Informal Perfection Calendar (H)
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Summary
Requires the department of transportation to pay for all fees and costs associated with memorial sign designations on roads and bridges for honoring deceased veterans, deceased law enforcement officers, or VFW posts
Title
Requires the department of transportation to pay for all fees and costs associated with memorial sign designations on roads and bridges for honoring deceased veterans, deceased law enforcement officers, or VFW posts
Sponsors
Rep. Don Mayhew [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-05-09 | House | Placed on the Informal Perfection Calendar (H) |
2022-05-05 | House | Placed Back on Formal Perfection Calendar (H) |
2022-04-20 | House | Placed on the Informal Perfection Calendar (H) |
2022-04-12 | House | Placed Back on Formal Perfection Calendar (H) |
2022-03-29 | House | Placed on the Informal Perfection Calendar (H) |
2022-03-23 | House | Reported Do Pass (H) - AYES: 10 NOES: 0 PRESENT: 0 |
2022-03-23 | House | Voted Do Pass (H) |
2022-03-23 | House | Executive Session Completed (H) |
2022-03-09 | House | Referred: Rules - Administrative Oversight(H) |
2022-03-09 | House | HCS Reported Do Pass (H) - AYES: 10 NOES: 0 PRESENT: 0 |
2022-03-08 | House | HCS Voted Do Pass (H) |
2022-03-08 | House | Executive Session Completed (H) |
2022-03-01 | House | Public Hearing Completed (H) |
2022-02-22 | House | Public Hearing Scheduled, Bill not Heard (H) |
2022-02-01 | House | Referred: Special Committee on Government Oversight(H) |
2022-01-06 | House | Read Second Time (H) |
2022-01-05 | House | Read First Time (H) |
2022-01-04 | House | Prefiled (H) |