MO HB214 | 2019 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on February 18 2019 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-05-16 - Placed on Informal Calendar
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on February 18 2019 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-05-16 - Placed on Informal Calendar
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Changes the laws regarding purchases to be made on competitive bids.
Title
Changes the laws regarding purchases to be made on competitive bids.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-02-18 - House - House: HB 214 HBs FOR THIRD READING (Y: 134 N: 18 NV: 0 Abs: 9) [PASS]
2019-02-13 - House - House: HB 214 (*HA 1) HBs FOR PERFECTION (Y: 43 N: 103 NV: 2 Abs: 13) [FAIL]
2019-02-13 - House - House: HB 214 (*HA 1) HBs FOR PERFECTION (Y: 43 N: 103 NV: 2 Abs: 13) [FAIL]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-05-16 | Senate | Placed on Informal Calendar |
2019-04-25 | Senate | Reported Do Pass (S) |
2019-04-02 | Senate | Voted Do Pass (S) |
2019-04-02 | Senate | Executive Session Held (S) |
2019-03-26 | Senate | Public Hearing Held (S) |
2019-03-21 | Senate | Public Hearing Scheduled (S) - Tuesday, March 26, 2019, 8:00 a.m., SCR 1 |
2019-03-07 | Senate | Second read and referred: Government Reform(S) |
2019-02-18 | House | Reported to the Senate and First Read (S) |
2019-02-18 | House | Third Read and Passed (H) - AYES: 134 NOES: 18 PRESENT: 0 |
2019-02-18 | House | Taken Up |
2019-02-13 | House | Perfected (H) |
2019-02-13 | House | Taken Up |
2019-02-12 | House | Laid Over (H) |
2019-02-12 | House | Title of Bill - Agreed To |
2019-02-12 | House | Taken Up |
2019-02-07 | House | Reported Do Pass (H) - AYES: 10 NOES: 0 PRESENT: 0 |
2019-02-06 | House | Voted Do Pass (H) |
2019-02-06 | House | Executive Session Completed (H) |
2019-02-05 | House | Referred: Rules - Legislative Oversight(H) |
2019-02-05 | House | Reported Do Pass (H) - AYES: 6 NOES: 1 PRESENT: 1 |
2019-02-04 | House | Voted Do Pass (H) |
2019-02-04 | House | Executive Session Completed (H) |
2019-01-28 | House | Public Hearing Completed (H) |
2019-01-16 | House | Referred: Downsizing State Government(H) |
2019-01-10 | House | Read Second Time (H) |
2019-01-09 | House | Read First Time (H) |
2018-12-10 | House | Prefiled (H) |