MO HB2133 | 2020 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 13 2020 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-03-12 - Referred: Rules - Legislative Oversight(H)
Pending: House Rules - Legislative Oversight Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 13 2020 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-03-12 - Referred: Rules - Legislative Oversight(H)
Pending: House Rules - Legislative Oversight Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Summary
Establishes procedures to recall a county commissioner.
Title
Establishes procedures to recall a county commissioner.
Sponsors
Rep. Doug Richey [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-03-12 | House | Referred: Rules - Legislative Oversight(H) |
2020-03-12 | House | HCS Reported Do Pass (H) - AYES: 5 NOES: 1 PRESENT: 0 |
2020-03-09 | House | HCS Voted Do Pass (H) |
2020-03-09 | House | Executive Session Completed (H) |
2020-03-02 | House | Public Hearing Completed (H) |
2020-02-13 | House | Referred: Crime Prevention and Public Safety(H) |
2020-01-14 | House | Read Second Time (H) |
2020-01-13 | House | Introduced and Read First Time (H) |