MO HB2128 | 2022 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 5 2022 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-05-13 - Referred: Transportation(H)
Pending: House Transportation Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 5 2022 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-05-13 - Referred: Transportation(H)
Pending: House Transportation Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Requires motor vehicle dealers to verify that the person who will be driving a newly purchased motor vehicle from the sales location holds a valid driver's license issued in this state or another state
Title
Requires motor vehicle dealers to verify that the person who will be driving a newly purchased motor vehicle from the sales location holds a valid driver's license issued in this state or another state
Sponsors
Rep. Ian Mackey [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-05-13 | House | Referred: Transportation(H) |
2022-01-06 | House | Read Second Time (H) |
2022-01-05 | House | Read First Time (H) |
2022-01-03 | House | Prefiled (H) |