MO HB2113 | 2022 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 5 2022 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-02-23 - Action Postponed (H)
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 5 2022 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-02-23 - Action Postponed (H)
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Modifies several provisions relating to elections
Title
Modifies several provisions relating to elections
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-02-23 | House | Action Postponed (H) |
2022-02-23 | House | Executive Session Continued |
2022-02-16 | House | Public Hearing Completed (H) |
2022-02-10 | House | Action Postponed (H) |
2022-02-10 | House | Executive Session Continued |
2022-02-09 | House | Public Hearing Continued (H) |
2022-01-20 | House | Referred: Elections and Elected Officials(H) |
2022-01-06 | House | Read Second Time (H) |
2022-01-05 | House | Read First Time (H) |
2021-12-30 | House | Prefiled (H) |