MO HB2093 | 2014 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Introduced on March 6 2014 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-04-07 - Voted Do Pass (H)
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on March 6 2014 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-04-07 - Voted Do Pass (H)
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Revises the definition of "employment" as it relates to employment security
Title
Revises the definition of "employment" as it relates to employment security
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-04-07 | House | Voted Do Pass (H) |
2014-04-07 | House | Executive Session Completed (H) |
2014-03-31 | House | Public Hearing Completed (H) |
2014-03-26 | House | Referred: Workforce Development and Workplace Safety(H) |
2014-03-10 | House | Read Second Time (H) |
2014-03-06 | House | Introduced and Read First Time (H) |
Missouri State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.house.mo.gov/billsummary.aspx?bill=HB2093&year=2014&code=R |
Text | https://www.house.mo.gov/billtracking/bills141/biltxt/intro/HB2093I.htm |