MO HB2092 | 2018 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 10 2018 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-03-29 - Referred: Rules - Administrative Oversight(H)
Pending: House Rules - Administrative Oversight Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 10 2018 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-03-29 - Referred: Rules - Administrative Oversight(H)
Pending: House Rules - Administrative Oversight Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Authorizes, upon voter approval, a ten-cent tax increase on motor fuel and twelve-cent tax increase on diesel fuel
Title
Authorizes, upon voter approval, a ten-cent tax increase on motor fuel and twelve-cent tax increase on diesel fuel
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-03-29 | House | Referred: Rules - Administrative Oversight(H) |
2018-03-29 | House | Reported Do Pass (H) - AYES: 8 NOES: 2 PRESENT: 0 |
2018-03-28 | House | Voted Do Pass (H) |
2018-03-28 | House | Executive Session Completed (H) |
2018-03-14 | House | Public Hearing Completed (H) |
2018-03-08 | House | Referred: Transportation(H) |
2018-01-11 | House | Read Second Time (H) |
2018-01-10 | House | Introduced and Read First Time (H) |
Missouri State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.house.mo.gov/Bill.aspx?bill=HB2092&year=2018&code=R |
Text | https://www.house.mo.gov/billtracking/bills181/hlrbillspdf/5608H.01I.pdf |