MO HB2088 | 2014 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on March 5 2014 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2014-04-15 - Public Hearing Completed (H)
Pending: House Agriculture Policy Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on March 5 2014 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2014-04-15 - Public Hearing Completed (H)
Pending: House Agriculture Policy Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Establishes the Farm-to-School Act to connect Missouri schools and farmers in order to provide locally grown food to schools
Title
Establishes the Farm-to-School Act to connect Missouri schools and farmers in order to provide locally grown food to schools
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-04-15 | House | Public Hearing Completed (H) |
2014-04-08 | House | Referred: Agriculture Policy(H) |
2014-03-06 | House | Read Second Time (H) |
2014-03-05 | House | Introduced and Read First Time (H) |
Missouri State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.house.mo.gov/billsummary.aspx?bill=HB2088&year=2014&code=R |
Text | https://www.house.mo.gov/billtracking/bills141/biltxt/intro/HB2088I.htm |