MO HB2079 | 2024 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 3 2024 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2024-05-02 - Placed Back on Formal Perfection Calendar (H)
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 3 2024 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2024-05-02 - Placed Back on Formal Perfection Calendar (H)
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Summary
Increase the prisoner reimbursement amount that the state is required to pay to counties
Title
Increase the prisoner reimbursement amount that the state is required to pay to counties
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-05-02 | House | Placed Back on Formal Perfection Calendar (H) |
2024-04-16 | House | Placed on the Informal Perfection Calendar (H) |
2024-04-15 | House | Placed Back on Formal Perfection Calendar (H) |
2024-04-03 | House | Placed on the Informal Perfection Calendar (H) |
2024-03-26 | House | Placed Back on Formal Perfection Calendar (H) |
2024-03-25 | House | Placed on the Informal Perfection Calendar (H) |
2024-03-12 | House | Placed Back on Formal Perfection Calendar (H) |
2024-02-26 | House | Placed on the Informal Perfection Calendar (H) |
2024-02-19 | House | Reported Do Pass (H) - AYES: 10 NOES: 0 PRESENT: 0 |
2024-02-19 | House | Voted Do Pass (H) |
2024-02-19 | House | Executive Session Completed (H) |
2024-02-14 | House | Referred: Rules - Administrative Oversight(H) |
2024-02-08 | House | HCS Reported Do Pass (H) - AYES: 8 NOES: 1 PRESENT: 0 |
2024-02-07 | House | HCS Voted Do Pass (H) |
2024-02-07 | House | Executive Session Completed (H) |
2024-01-17 | House | Public Hearing Completed (H) |
2024-01-05 | House | Referred: Corrections and Public Institutions(H) |
2024-01-04 | House | Read Second Time (H) |
2024-01-03 | House | Read First Time (H) |
2023-12-21 | House | Prefiled (H) |