MO HB2062 | 2024 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on July 12 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-07-12 - Delivered to Secretary of State (G)
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on July 12 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-07-12 - Delivered to Secretary of State (G)
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Establishes provisions relating to the use of real property
Title
Establishes provisions relating to the use of real property
Sponsors
Rep. Chris Brown [R] |
Roll Calls
2024-05-07 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading (Y: 21 N: 9 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
House - House: HBs WITH SENATE AMENDMENTS (Y: 145 N: 1 NV: 3 Abs: 13) [PASS]
House - House: HBs WITH SENATE AMENDMENTS (Y: 145 N: 1 NV: 3 Abs: 13) [PASS]
House - House: HBs WITH SENATE AMENDMENTS (Y: 109 N: 37 NV: 0 Abs: 16) [PASS]
House - House: HBs FOR THIRD READING (Y: 111 N: 26 NV: 15 Abs: 10) [PASS]
House - House: HBs FOR THIRD READING (Y: 106 N: 44 NV: 0 Abs: 12) [PASS]
House - House: HBs FOR PERFECTION (Y: 97 N: 44 NV: 0 Abs: 21) [PASS]
House - House: HBs WITH SENATE AMENDMENTS (Y: 145 N: 1 NV: 3 Abs: 13) [PASS]
House - House: HBs WITH SENATE AMENDMENTS (Y: 145 N: 1 NV: 3 Abs: 13) [PASS]
House - House: HBs WITH SENATE AMENDMENTS (Y: 109 N: 37 NV: 0 Abs: 16) [PASS]
House - House: HBs FOR THIRD READING (Y: 111 N: 26 NV: 15 Abs: 10) [PASS]
House - House: HBs FOR THIRD READING (Y: 106 N: 44 NV: 0 Abs: 12) [PASS]
House - House: HBs FOR PERFECTION (Y: 97 N: 44 NV: 0 Abs: 21) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-07-12 | House | Delivered to Secretary of State (G) |
2024-07-12 | House | Approved by Governor (G) |
2024-05-30 | House | Delivered to Governor |
2024-05-30 | House | Signed by President Pro Tem (S) |
2024-05-30 | House | Signed by House Speaker (H) |
2024-05-30 | House | Constitutional Objection Filed (S) |
2024-05-21 | House | House Message (H) |
2024-05-16 | House | Truly Agreed To and Finally Passed - AYES: 145 NOES: 1 PRESENT: 3 |
2024-05-16 | House | House Adopts (H) - SS as amended AYES: 145 NOES: 1 PRESENT: 3 |
2024-05-16 | House | Taken Up |
2024-05-09 | House | Reported Do Pass (H) - AYES: 5 NOES: 2 PRESENT: 0 |
2024-05-09 | House | Voted Do Pass (H) |
2024-05-09 | House | Executive Session Completed (H) |
2024-05-08 | House | Referred: Fiscal Review(H) |
2024-05-08 | Senate | Reported to the House with... (H) - SS as amended |
2024-05-07 | Senate | Third Read and Passed with Amendments (S) - SS, as amended AYES: 21 NOES: 9 PRESENT: 0 |
2024-05-07 | Senate | SS Adopted (S) - SA 2, SA 3, SA 4, SA 5, SA 6, adopted. |
2024-05-07 | Senate | SS Offered |
2024-05-07 | Senate | Taken Up for Third Reading (S) |
2024-05-07 | Senate | Placed on Informal Calendar |
2024-04-22 | Senate | Reported Do Pass (S) |
2024-04-09 | Senate | Voted Do Pass (S) |
2024-03-12 | Senate | Public Hearing Held (S) |
2024-03-11 | Senate | Public Hearing Scheduled (S) - Tuesday, March 12, 2024, 10:00 a.m., Senate Committee Room 1 |
2024-03-07 | Senate | Second read and referred: Emerging Issues(S) |
2024-02-12 | House | Reported to the Senate and First Read (S) |
2024-02-12 | House | Third Read and Passed (H) - AYES: 111 NOES: 26 PRESENT: 15 |
2024-02-12 | House | Taken Up for Third Reading (H) |
2024-02-07 | House | Perfected (H) |
2024-02-07 | House | Title of Bill - Agreed To |
2024-02-07 | House | Taken Up for Perfection (H) |
2024-01-29 | House | Reported Do Pass (H) - AYES: 9 NOES: 0 PRESENT: 0 |
2024-01-29 | House | Voted Do Pass (H) |
2024-01-29 | House | Executive Session Completed (H) |
2024-01-25 | House | Referred: Rules - Regulatory Oversight(H) |
2024-01-24 | House | Reported Do Pass (H) - AYES: 8 NOES: 0 PRESENT: 0 |
2024-01-23 | House | Voted Do Pass (H) |
2024-01-23 | House | Executive Session Completed (H) |
2024-01-17 | House | Public Hearing Completed (H) |
2024-01-04 | House | Referred: Special Committee on Small Business(H) |
2024-01-04 | House | Read Second Time (H) |
2024-01-03 | House | Read First Time (H) |
2023-12-20 | House | Prefiled (H) |