MO HB2061 | 2022 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 5 2022 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-05-13 - Referred: Public Safety(H)
Pending: House Public Safety Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 5 2022 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-05-13 - Referred: Public Safety(H)
Pending: House Public Safety Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Requires law enforcement agencies that use confidential informants to adopt certain policies and procedures
Title
Requires law enforcement agencies that use confidential informants to adopt certain policies and procedures
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-05-13 | House | Referred: Public Safety(H) |
2022-01-06 | House | Read Second Time (H) |
2022-01-05 | House | Read First Time (H) |
2021-12-21 | House | Prefiled (H) |