MO HB206 | 2019 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 9 2019 - 25% progression
Action: 2019-01-15 - HCS Reported Do Pass (H)
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

Designates the Cloria Brown Memorial Highway in St. Louis County

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Designates the Cloria Brown Memorial Highway in St. Louis County

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2019-01-15HouseHCS Reported Do Pass (H)
2019-01-15HouseHCS Voted Do Pass (H)
2019-01-15HouseExecutive Session Completed (H)
2019-01-15HousePublic Hearing Completed (H)
2019-01-14HouseReferred: Transportation(H)
2019-01-10HouseRead Second Time (H)
2019-01-09HouseRead First Time (H)
2018-12-10HousePrefiled (H)

Missouri State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback