MO HB2058 | 2016 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 16 2016 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-04-13 - Executive Session Held (S) - Voted do pass
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]

Summary

Establishes the Cronkite New Voices Act

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Establishes the Cronkite New Voices Act

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2016-03-15 - House - House: HB 2058 HBs 3rd READING - CONSENT (Y: 131 N: 12 NV: 1 Abs: 18) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2016-04-13SenateExecutive Session Held (S) - Voted do pass
2016-04-13SenatePublic Hearing Held (S)
2016-04-11SenateExecutive Session Scheduled
2016-04-11SenatePublic Hearing Scheduled (S) - Wednesday, April 13, 2016, 2:00pm, Senate Lounge
2016-03-31SenateSecond read and referred: Senate Education(S)
2016-03-16HouseReported to the Senate and First Read (S)
2016-03-15HouseThird Read and Passed (H) - AYES: 131 NOES: 12 PRESENT: 1
2016-03-15HouseTaken Up
2016-03-07HousePerfected by Consent - Pursuant to House Rules (H)
2016-02-18HouseRules - Reported Do Pass - Consent (H) - AYES: 7 NOES: 0 PRESENT: 0
2016-02-17HouseRules - Voted Do Pass - Consent (H)
2016-02-17HouseRules - Executive Session Completed (H)
2016-02-04HouseReferred: Select Committee on Rules(H)
2016-02-04HouseReported Do Pass by Consent (H) - AYES: 9 NOES: 0 PRESENT: 0
2016-02-03HouseVoted Do Pass - Consent (H)
2016-02-03HouseExecutive Session Completed (H)
2016-02-01HousePublic Hearing Completed (H)
2016-01-20HouseReferred: Emerging Issues(H)
2016-01-07HouseRead Second Time (H)
2016-01-06HouseIntroduced and Read First Time (H)

Missouri State Sources


Bill Comments 750

feedback