MO HB2054 | 2016 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 6 2016 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-03-03 - HCS Reported Do Pass (H) - AYES: 10 NOES: 0 PRESENT: 0
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]

Summary

Modifies provisions of law relating to the sale or consumption of alcohol

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Modifies provisions of law relating to the sale or consumption of alcohol

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2016-03-03HouseHCS Reported Do Pass (H) - AYES: 10 NOES: 0 PRESENT: 0
2016-02-24HouseHCS Voted Do Pass (H)
2016-02-24HouseExecutive Session Completed (H)
2016-02-11HouseReferred: Select Committee on General Laws(H)
2016-02-11HouseReported Do Pass with Amendments (H) - HCA 1 AYES: 11 NOES: 1 PRESENT: 0
2016-02-10HouseVoted Do Pass with Amendments (H)
2016-02-10HouseExecutive Session Completed (H)
2016-01-27HousePublic Hearing Completed (H)
2016-01-12HouseReferred: Emerging Issues(H)
2016-01-07HouseRead Second Time (H)
2016-01-06HouseIntroduced and Read First Time (H)

Missouri State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback