MO HB2049 | 2020 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 9 2020 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-05-06 - Placed on Informal Calendar
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on March 9 2020 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-05-06 - Placed on Informal Calendar
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Summary
Modifies provisions relating to the enforcement of arbitration awards and intervention in court proceedings for insurance companies.
Title
Modifies provisions relating to the enforcement of arbitration awards and intervention in court proceedings for insurance companies.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2020-03-05 - House - House: HB 2049 HBs FOR THIRD READING - INFORMAL (Y: 102 N: 44 NV: 0 Abs: 16) [PASS]
2020-03-05 - House - House: HB 2049 HBs FOR THIRD READING - INFORMAL (Y: 90 N: 57 NV: 0 Abs: 15) [PASS]
2020-03-05 - House - House: HB 2049 HBs FOR THIRD READING - INFORMAL (Y: 90 N: 57 NV: 0 Abs: 15) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-05-06 | Senate | Placed on Informal Calendar |
2020-04-30 | Senate | SCS Reported Do Pass (S) |
2020-04-28 | Senate | SCS Voted Do Pass (S) |
2020-04-28 | Senate | Public Hearing Held (S) |
2020-04-22 | Senate | Public Hearing Scheduled (S) - 8:00 a.m., Tuesday, April 28, 2020, Joint Committee Room |
2020-03-12 | Senate | Second read and referred: Government Reform(S) |
2020-03-09 | House | Reported to the Senate and First Read (S) |
2020-03-05 | House | Third Read and Passed (H) - AYES: 90 NOES: 57 PRESENT: 0 |
2020-03-05 | House | Taken Up for Third Reading (H) |
2020-03-05 | House | Placed on the Informal Third Reading Calendar (H) |
2020-03-03 | House | Perfected with Amendments (H) - HA 1 adopted |
2020-03-03 | House | HCS Adopted (H) |
2020-03-03 | House | Title of Bill - Agreed To |
2020-03-03 | House | Taken Up for Perfection (H) |
2020-02-11 | House | Reported Do Pass (H) - AYES: 6 NOES: 2 PRESENT: 0 |
2020-02-10 | House | Voted Do Pass (H) |
2020-02-10 | House | Executive Session Completed (H) |
2020-01-29 | House | Referred: Rules - Administrative Oversight(H) |
2020-01-29 | House | HCS Reported Do Pass (H) - AYES: 11 NOES: 6 PRESENT: 0 |
2020-01-28 | House | HCS Voted Do Pass (H) |
2020-01-28 | House | Executive Session Completed (H) |
2020-01-21 | House | Public Hearing Completed (H) |
2020-01-09 | House | Referred: Judiciary(H) |
2020-01-09 | House | Read Second Time (H) |
2020-01-08 | House | Introduced and Read First Time (H) |