MO HB2049 | 2014 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Introduced on February 27 2014 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-04-22 - Rules - Reported Do Pass (H)
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 27 2014 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-04-22 - Rules - Reported Do Pass (H)
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Summary
Allows certain employers to retain withholding income tax payable by the employer in an amount equal to the federal unemployment tax act credit rate deduction
Title
Allows certain employers to retain withholding income tax payable by the employer in an amount equal to the federal unemployment tax act credit rate deduction
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-04-22 | House | Rules - Reported Do Pass (H) |
2014-04-22 | House | Rules - Voted Do Pass (H) |
2014-04-22 | House | Rules - Executive Session Completed (H) |
2014-04-09 | House | Referred: Rules(H) |
2014-04-09 | House | HCS Reported Do Pass (H) |
2014-04-08 | House | HCS Voted Do Pass (H) |
2014-04-08 | House | Executive Session Completed (H) |
2014-04-01 | House | Public Hearing Completed (H) |
2014-03-12 | House | Referred: Ways and Means(H) |
2014-03-03 | House | Read Second Time (H) |
2014-02-27 | House | Introduced and Read First Time (H) |