MO HB2046 | 2020 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on July 6 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-07-06 - Delivered to Secretary of State (G)
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

Modifies provisions relating to professional registration.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Modifies provisions relating to professional registration.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2020-05-12 - House - House: HB 2046 BILLS IN CONFERENCE (Y: 117 N: 34 NV: 0 Abs: 11) [PASS]
2020-05-12 - House - House: HB 2046 BILLS IN CONFERENCE (Y: 120 N: 31 NV: 0 Abs: 11) [PASS]
2020-04-30 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading (Y: 29 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-01-30 - House - House: HB 2046 HBs FOR THIRD READING (Y: 114 N: 38 NV: 0 Abs: 10) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2020-07-06HouseDelivered to Secretary of State (G)
2020-07-06HouseApproved by Governor (G)
2020-05-27HouseDelivered to Governor
2020-05-27HouseSigned by President Pro Tem (S)
2020-05-27HouseSigned by House Speaker(H)
2020-05-12HouseSenate Message (S)
2020-05-12HouseTruly Agreed To and Finally Passed - AYES: 31 NOES: 0 PRESENT: 0
2020-05-12HouseSenate Adopts Conference Committee Report (S) - AYES: 31 NOES: 0 PRESENT: 0
2020-05-12HouseSenate Submits Conference Committee Report (S)
2020-05-12HouseHouse Message (H)
2020-05-12HouseThird Read and Passed (H) - AYES: 120 NOES: 31 PRESENT: 0
2020-05-12HouseHouse Adopts Conference Committee Report (H) - AYES: 117 NOES: 34 PRESENT: 0
2020-05-12HouseHouse Submits Conference Committee Report (H)
2020-05-12HouseReported Do Pass (H) - AYES: 10 NOES: 0 PRESENT: 0
2020-05-12HouseVoted Do Pass (H)
2020-05-12HouseExecutive Session Completed (H)
2020-05-11HouseReferred: Fiscal Review(H)
2020-05-11HouseHouse Distributes Conference Committee Report (H)
2020-05-08HouseHouse Message (H)
2020-05-08HouseHouse Conference Committee Appointed (H) - REPRESENTATIVES GRIER, HOUX, ROSS, CARPENTER, BROWN(27)
2020-05-08HouseConferees to Exceed Differences (H)
2020-05-08HouseTaken Up
2020-05-08HouseSenate Message (S)
2020-05-08HouseSenate Conference Committee Appointed (S) - BERNSKOETTER, RIDDLE, KOENIG, WALSH, SIFTON
2020-05-08HouseConferees to Exceed Differences (S)
2020-05-08HouseSenate Refuses to Recede, Grants Conference (S)
2020-05-06HouseHouse Message (H)
2020-05-06HouseHouse Refuses to Adopt, Requests Senate to Recede or Grant Conference
2020-05-06HouseTaken Up
2020-05-06HouseReported Do Pass (H) - AYES: 9 NOES: 0 PRESENT: 0
2020-05-06HouseVoted Do Pass (H)
2020-05-06HouseExecutive Session Completed (H)
2020-04-30HouseReferred: Fiscal Review(H)
2020-04-30SenateReported to the House with... (H) - SS, as amended
2020-04-30SenateThird Read and Passed (H) - AYES: 29 NOES: 0 PRESENT: 0
2020-04-30SenateSS Adopted (S) - SS, as amended
2020-04-30SenateMotion to Reconsider Adopted (S) - Motion to reconsider the adoption of SS, as amended adopted and a motion to reconsider the adoption of SA 10 adopted.
2020-04-30SenateTaken Up
2020-04-30SenateReported Do Pass (S)
2020-04-30SenateVoted Do Pass (S)
2020-04-30SenateExecutive Session Held (S)
2020-04-29SenateExecutive Session Scheduled - 9:30 a.m., Thursday, April 30, 2020, Joint Committee Room
2020-04-28SenateReferred: Fiscal Oversight(S)
2020-04-28SenateSS Adopted (S) - as amended
2020-04-28SenateSenate Substitute Offered (S)
2020-04-28SenateTaken Up for Third Reading (S)
2020-04-27SenateReported Do Pass (S)
2020-03-02SenateVoted Do Pass (S)
2020-03-02SenateExecutive Session Held (S)
2020-02-24SenatePublic Hearing Held (S)
2020-02-20SenatePublic Hearing Scheduled (S) - Monday, February 24, 2020, 2:00pm, Senate Lounge
2020-02-20SenateSecond read and referred: Professional Registration(S)
2020-01-30HouseReported to the Senate and First Read (S)
2020-01-30HouseThird Read and Passed (H) - AYES: 114 NOES: 38 PRESENT: 0
2020-01-30HouseTaken Up for Third Reading (H)
2020-01-28HousePerfected with Amendments (H) - HA 1 adopted
2020-01-28HouseHCS Adopted (H)
2020-01-28HouseTitle of Bill - Agreed To
2020-01-28HouseTaken Up for Perfection (H)
2020-01-21HouseReported Do Pass (H) - AYES: 6 NOES: 2 PRESENT: 0
2020-01-21HouseVoted Do Pass (H)
2020-01-21HouseExecutive Session Completed (H)
2020-01-15HouseReferred: Rules - Administrative Oversight(H)
2020-01-15HouseHCS Reported Do Pass (H) - AYES: 12 NOES: 1 PRESENT: 0
2020-01-15HouseHCS Voted Do Pass (H)
2020-01-15HouseExecutive Session Completed (H)
2020-01-14HousePublic Hearing Completed (H)
2020-01-09HouseReferred: Professional Registration and Licensing(H)
2020-01-09HouseRead Second Time (H)
2020-01-08HouseIntroduced and Read First Time (H)

Missouri State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttps://www.house.mo.gov/Bill.aspx?bill=HB2046&year=2020&code=R
Texthttps://www.house.mo.gov/billtracking/bills201/hlrbillspdf/4438H.01I.pdf
Texthttps://www.house.mo.gov/billtracking/bills201/hlrbillspdf/4438H.02C.pdf
Texthttps://www.house.mo.gov/billtracking/bills201/hlrbillspdf/4438H.02P.pdf
Texthttps://www.house.mo.gov/billtracking/bills201/hlrbillspdf/4438S.05F.pdf
Texthttps://www.house.mo.gov/billtracking/bills201/hlrbillspdf/4438H.06S.pdf
Texthttps://www.house.mo.gov/billtracking/bills201/hlrbillspdf/4438H.06T.pdf
Roll Callhttps://www.house.mo.gov/billtracking/bills201/rollcalls/013.003.pdf
Roll Callhttps://www.senate.mo.gov/20info/Journals/RDay460430786-835.pdf#832
Roll Callhttps://www.house.mo.gov/billtracking/bills201/rollcalls/061.009.pdf
Roll Callhttps://www.house.mo.gov/billtracking/bills201/rollcalls/061.008.pdf

Bill Comments

feedback