MO HB2033 | 2020 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on January 28 2020 - 50% progression
Action: 2020-02-20 - Second read and referred: Commerce, Consumer Protection, Energy and the Environment(S)
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]

Summary

Modifies provisions for eminent domain for utility purposes.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Modifies provisions for eminent domain for utility purposes.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2020-01-27 - House - House: HB 2033 HBs FOR THIRD READING (Y: 118 N: 42 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2020-02-20SenateSecond read and referred: Commerce, Consumer Protection, Energy and the Environment(S)
2020-01-28HouseReported to the Senate and First Read (S)
2020-01-27HouseThird Read and Passed (H) - AYES: 118 NOES: 42 PRESENT: 0
2020-01-27HouseTaken Up
2020-01-22HousePerfected with Amendments (H) - HA 1 adopted
2020-01-22HouseHCS Adopted (H)
2020-01-22HouseTitle of Bill - Agreed To
2020-01-22HouseTaken Up
2020-01-15HouseReported Do Pass (H) - AYES: 5 NOES: 3 PRESENT: 0
2020-01-15HouseVoted Do Pass (H)
2020-01-15HouseExecutive Session Completed (H)
2020-01-14HouseReferred: Rules - Legislative Oversight(H)
2020-01-14HouseHCS Reported Do Pass (H) - AYES: 9 NOES: 4 PRESENT: 0
2020-01-14HouseHCS Voted Do Pass (H)
2020-01-14HouseExecutive Session Completed (H)
2020-01-13HousePublic Hearing Completed (H)
2020-01-09HouseReferred: General Laws(H)
2020-01-09HouseRead Second Time (H)
2020-01-08HouseIntroduced and Read First Time (H)

Missouri State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback