MO HB2031 | 2018 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on April 3 2018 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-05-14 - Placed on Informal Calendar
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]

Summary

Modifies provisions regarding service dogs.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Modifies provisions regarding service dogs.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2018-04-03 - House - House: HB 2031 HBs FOR THIRD READING (Y: 150 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 10) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2018-05-14SenatePlaced on Informal Calendar
2018-05-07SenateReported Do Pass (S)
2018-04-25SenateExecutive Session Held (S) - Voted do pass
2018-04-18SenatePublic Hearing Held (S)
2018-04-17SenatePublic Hearing Scheduled (S) - Wednesday, April 18, 2018, 1:00pm, SCR 1
2018-04-05SenateSecond read and referred: Senate General Laws(S)
2018-04-03HouseReported to the Senate and First Read (S)
2018-04-03HouseThird Read and Passed (H) - AYES: 150 NOES: 1 PRESENT: 0
2018-04-03HouseTaken Up
2018-03-26HousePerfected with Amendments (H) - HA 1 adopted
2018-03-26HouseHCS Adopted (H)
2018-03-26HouseTitle of Bill - Agreed To
2018-03-26HouseTaken Up for Perfection (H)
2018-03-01HouseReported Do Pass (H) - AYES: 9 NOES: 0 PRESENT: 0
2018-02-28HouseVoted Do Pass (H)
2018-02-28HouseExecutive Session Completed (H)
2018-02-21HouseReferred: Rules - Legislative Oversight(H)
2018-02-21HouseHCS Reported Do Pass (H) - AYES: 12 NOES: 0 PRESENT: 0
2018-02-20HouseHCS Voted Do Pass (H)
2018-02-20HouseExecutive Session Completed (H)
2018-02-13HouseAction Postponed (H)
2018-02-13HouseExecutive Session Continued
2018-02-06HousePublic Hearing Completed (H)
2018-01-24HouseReferred: Agriculture Policy(H)
2018-01-10HouseRead Second Time (H)
2018-01-09HouseIntroduced and Read First Time (H)

Missouri State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback