MO HB2030 | 2020 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 8 2020 - 25% progression
Action: 2020-02-11 - Reported Do Pass (H) - AYES: 6 NOES: 4 PRESENT: 0
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]

Summary

Establishes the Missouri Video Lottery Control Act

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Establishes the Missouri Video Lottery Control Act

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2020-02-11HouseReported Do Pass (H) - AYES: 6 NOES: 4 PRESENT: 0
2020-02-11HouseVoted Do Pass (H)
2020-02-11HouseExecutive Session Completed (H)
2020-01-30HouseReferred: Rules - Legislative Oversight(H)
2020-01-30HouseHCS Reported Do Pass (H) - AYES: 5 NOES: 2 PRESENT: 0
2020-01-28HouseHCS Voted Do Pass (H)
2020-01-28HouseExecutive Session Completed (H)
2020-01-22HousePublic Hearing Completed (H)
2020-01-09HouseReferred: Special Committee on Government Oversight(H)
2020-01-09HouseRead Second Time (H)
2020-01-08HouseIntroduced and Read First Time (H)

Missouri State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback