MO HB2014 | 2016 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 29 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-05-09 - Delivered to Secretary of State (G)
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 29 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-05-09 - Delivered to Secretary of State (G)
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
To appropriate money for supplemental purposes for the several departments and offices of state government.
Title
To appropriate money for supplemental purposes for the several departments and offices of state government.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2016-04-21 - House - House: HB 2014 BILLS IN CONFERENCE (Y: 128 N: 11 NV: 0 Abs: 23) [PASS]
2016-04-21 - House - House: HB 2014 BILLS IN CONFERENCE (Y: 131 N: 8 NV: 0 Abs: 23) [PASS]
2016-04-12 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2016-03-17 - House - House: HB 2014 HABs FOR THIRD READING (Y: 139 N: 7 NV: 0 Abs: 16) [PASS]
2016-04-21 - House - House: HB 2014 BILLS IN CONFERENCE (Y: 131 N: 8 NV: 0 Abs: 23) [PASS]
2016-04-12 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2016-03-17 - House - House: HB 2014 HABs FOR THIRD READING (Y: 139 N: 7 NV: 0 Abs: 16) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-05-09 | House | Delivered to Secretary of State (G) |
2016-04-29 | House | Approved by Governor (G) |
2016-04-21 | House | Delivered to Governor |
2016-04-21 | House | Signed by President Pro Tem (S) |
2016-04-21 | House | Signed by House Speaker(H) |
2016-04-21 | House | Senate Message (S) |
2016-04-21 | House | Truly Agreed To and Finally Passed - AYES: 32 NOES: 0 PRESENT: 0 |
2016-04-21 | House | Senate Adopts Conference Committee Report (S) - AYES: 32 NOES: 0 PRESENT: 0 |
2016-04-21 | House | Senate Submits Conference Committee Report (S) |
2016-04-21 | House | Taken Up |
2016-04-21 | House | House Message (H) |
2016-04-21 | House | Third Read and Passed (H) - AYES: 131 NOES: 8 PRESENT: 0 |
2016-04-21 | House | House Adopts Conference Committee Report (H) - AYES: 128 NOES: 11 PRESENT: 0 |
2016-04-21 | House | House Submits Conference Committee Report (H) |
2016-04-21 | House | Reported Do Pass (H) |
2016-04-21 | House | Voted Do Pass (H) |
2016-04-21 | House | Executive Session Completed (H) |
2016-04-20 | House | Referred: Fiscal Review(H) |
2016-04-20 | House | House Distributes Conference Committee Report (H) |
2016-04-20 | House | House Message (H) |
2016-04-19 | House | Conferee Removed - Alferman replacing Flanigan |
2016-04-12 | House | House Message (H) |
2016-04-12 | House | House Conference Committee Appointed (H) - REPRESENTATIVES FLANIGAN, FITZPATRICK, ALLEN, MCCANN BEATTY, MONTECILLO |
2016-04-12 | House | Senate Message (S) |
2016-04-12 | House | Senate Conference Committee Appointed (S) - SCHAEFER, SILVEY, BROWN, CURLS, WALSH |
2016-04-12 | House | Senate Refuses to Recede, Grants Conference (S) |
2016-04-12 | House | House Message (H) |
2016-04-12 | House | House Refuses to Adopt, Requests Senate to Recede or Grant Conference |
2016-04-12 | House | Taken Up |
2016-04-12 | Senate | Reported to the House with... (H) - SCS |
2016-04-12 | Senate | Third Read and Passed (S) - AYES: 31 NOES: 0 PRESENT: 0 |
2016-04-12 | Senate | SCS Adopted (S) |
2016-04-12 | Senate | Taken Up |
2016-04-11 | Senate | SCS Reported Do Pass (S) |
2016-04-11 | Senate | Executive Session Held (S) - SCS voted do pass |
2016-04-07 | Senate | Public Hearing Scheduled (S) - Monday, April 11, 2016, 1:30pm, Senate Committee Room 2 |
2016-03-31 | Senate | Second read and referred: Senate Appropriations(S) |
2016-03-23 | House | Reported to the Senate and First Read (S) |
2016-03-17 | House | Third Read and Passed (H) - AYES: 139 NOES: 7 PRESENT: 0 |
2016-03-17 | House | Taken Up |
2016-03-16 | House | Perfected (H) |
2016-03-16 | House | HCS Adopted (H) |
2016-03-16 | House | Taken Up |
2016-03-09 | House | HCS Reported Do Pass (H) - AYES: 23 NOES: 0 PRESENT: 0 |
2016-03-09 | House | HCS Voted Do Pass (H) |
2016-03-09 | House | Executive Session Completed (H) |
2016-03-03 | House | Public Hearing Completed (H) |
2016-02-29 | House | Referred: Select Committee on Budget(H) |
2016-02-29 | House | Read Second Time (H) |
2016-02-25 | House | Introduced and Read First Time (H) |