MO HB2012 | 2022 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on April 6 2022 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-05-04 - Referred: Governmental Accountability and Fiscal Oversight(S)
Pending: Senate Governmental Accountability & Fiscal Oversight Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on April 6 2022 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-05-04 - Referred: Governmental Accountability and Fiscal Oversight(S)
Pending: Senate Governmental Accountability & Fiscal Oversight Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Summary
Modifies provisions relating to health care
Title
Modifies provisions relating to health care
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2022-04-06 - House - House: HB 2012 HBs 3rd READ - INFORMAL (Y: 91 N: 37 NV: 0 Abs: 29) [PASS]
2022-03-29 - House - House: HB 2012 (HA 2, A.A.) HBs PERFECTION - INFORMAL (Y: 92 N: 45 NV: 0 Abs: 20) [PASS]
2022-03-29 - House - House: HB 2012 (HA 1 HA 2) HBs PERFECTION - INFORMAL (Y: 90 N: 47 NV: 0 Abs: 20) [PASS]
2022-03-29 - House - House: HB 2012 (*HSA 1 HA 3, A.A.) HBs PERFECTION - INFORMAL (Y: 86 N: 42 NV: 0 Abs: 29) [PASS]
2022-03-29 - House - House: HB 2012 (*HSA 1 HA 3, A.A.) HBs PERFECTION - INFORMAL (Y: 93 N: 48 NV: 0 Abs: 16) [PASS]
2022-03-29 - House - House: HB 2012 (HA 2, A.A.) HBs PERFECTION - INFORMAL (Y: 92 N: 45 NV: 0 Abs: 20) [PASS]
2022-03-29 - House - House: HB 2012 (HA 1 HA 2) HBs PERFECTION - INFORMAL (Y: 90 N: 47 NV: 0 Abs: 20) [PASS]
2022-03-29 - House - House: HB 2012 (*HSA 1 HA 3, A.A.) HBs PERFECTION - INFORMAL (Y: 86 N: 42 NV: 0 Abs: 29) [PASS]
2022-03-29 - House - House: HB 2012 (*HSA 1 HA 3, A.A.) HBs PERFECTION - INFORMAL (Y: 93 N: 48 NV: 0 Abs: 16) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-05-04 | Senate | Referred: Governmental Accountability and Fiscal Oversight(S) |
2022-05-03 | Senate | SCS Reported Do Pass (S) |
2022-04-27 | Senate | SCS Voted Do Pass (S) |
2022-04-27 | Senate | Executive Session Held (S) |
2022-04-20 | Senate | Public Hearing Held (S) |
2022-04-14 | Senate | Public Hearing Scheduled (S) - Wednesday, April 20, 2022, 9:00 a.m., Senate Committee Room 1. |
2022-04-14 | Senate | Second read and referred: Seniors, Families, Veterans and Military Affairs(S) |
2022-04-06 | House | Reported to the Senate and First Read (S) |
2022-04-06 | House | Third Read and Passed (H) - AYES: 91 NOES: 37 PRESENT: 0 |
2022-04-06 | House | Taken Up for Third Reading (H) |
2022-04-06 | House | Placed on the Informal Third Reading Calendar (H) |
2022-04-04 | House | Reported Do Pass (H) - AYES: 5 NOES: 2 PRESENT: 0 |
2022-04-04 | House | Voted Do Pass (H) |
2022-04-04 | House | Executive Session Completed (H) |
2022-03-30 | House | Referred: Fiscal Review(H) |
2022-03-29 | House | Perfected with Amendments (H) - HA 1, HA 1 to HA 2, HA 2, as amended, HA 1 to HSA 1 for HA 3, HSA 1 for HA 3, as amended, adopted. |
2022-03-29 | House | HCS Adopted (H) |
2022-03-29 | House | Title of Bill - Agreed To |
2022-03-29 | House | Taken Up for Perfection (H) |
2022-03-22 | House | Placed on the Informal Perfection Calendar (H) |
2022-03-10 | House | Placed Back on Formal Perfection Calendar (H) |
2022-02-23 | House | Placed on the Informal Perfection Calendar (H) |
2022-02-07 | House | Reported Do Pass (H) - AYES: 10 NOES: 3 PRESENT: 0 |
2022-02-07 | House | Voted Do Pass (H) |
2022-02-07 | House | Executive Session Completed (H) |
2022-01-27 | House | Referred: Rules - Administrative Oversight(H) |
2022-01-27 | House | HCS Reported Do Pass (H) - AYES: 8 NOES: 3 PRESENT: 0 |
2022-01-27 | House | HCS Voted Do Pass (H) |
2022-01-27 | House | Executive Session Completed (H) |
2022-01-26 | House | Public Hearing Completed (H) |
2022-01-20 | House | Referred: Special Committee on Government Oversight(H) |
2022-01-06 | House | Read Second Time (H) |
2022-01-05 | House | Read First Time (H) |
2021-12-16 | House | Prefiled (H) |