MO HB201 | 2021 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 11 2021 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-04-20 - Public Hearing Held (S)
Pending: Senate Transportation, Infrastructure and Public Safety Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on March 11 2021 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-04-20 - Public Hearing Held (S)
Pending: Senate Transportation, Infrastructure and Public Safety Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Adds specified elected officals and government employees to the list of persons whose motor vehicle and driver's license records are to be kept confidential
Title
Adds specified elected officals and government employees to the list of persons whose motor vehicle and driver's license records are to be kept confidential
Sponsors
Rep. Mike McGirl [R] |
Roll Calls
2021-03-11 - House - House: HB 201 HBs FOR THIRD READING (Y: 110 N: 48 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2021-03-09 - House - House: HB 201 (HA 1 HA 1) HBs PERFECTION - INFORMAL (Y: 108 N: 44 NV: 0 Abs: 10) [PASS]
2021-03-09 - House - House: HB 201 (*HA 1, A.A.) HBs PERFECTION - INFORMAL (Y: 104 N: 48 NV: 2 Abs: 8) [PASS]
2021-03-09 - House - House: HB 201 (HA 1 HA 1) HBs PERFECTION - INFORMAL (Y: 108 N: 44 NV: 0 Abs: 10) [PASS]
2021-03-09 - House - House: HB 201 (*HA 1, A.A.) HBs PERFECTION - INFORMAL (Y: 104 N: 48 NV: 2 Abs: 8) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-04-20 | Senate | Public Hearing Held (S) |
2021-04-15 | Senate | Public Hearing Scheduled (S) - Tuesday, April 20, 8:30 a.m., SCR 1 |
2021-03-25 | Senate | Second read and referred: Transportation, Infrastructure and Public Safety(S) |
2021-03-11 | House | Reported to the Senate and First Read (S) |
2021-03-11 | House | Third Read and Passed (H) - AYES: 110 NOES: 48 PRESENT: 0 |
2021-03-11 | House | Taken Up for Third Reading (H) |
2021-03-09 | House | Perfected with Amendments (H) - HA 1 to HA 1, HA 1 as amended adopted |
2021-03-09 | House | Title of Bill - Agreed To |
2021-03-09 | House | Taken Up for Perfection (H) |
2021-03-08 | House | Placed on the Informal Perfection Calendar (H) |
2021-03-02 | House | Reported Do Pass (H) - AYES: 8 NOES: 0 PRESENT: 0 |
2021-03-01 | House | Voted Do Pass (H) |
2021-03-01 | House | Executive Session Completed (H) |
2021-02-08 | House | Referred: Rules - Legislative Oversight(H) |
2021-02-08 | House | Reported Do Pass (H) - AYES: 13 NOES: 0 PRESENT: 0 |
2021-02-08 | House | Voted Do Pass (H) |
2021-02-08 | House | Executive Session Completed (H) |
2021-01-27 | House | Public Hearing Completed (H) |
2021-01-14 | House | Referred: Transportation(H) |
2021-01-07 | House | Read Second Time (H) |
2021-01-06 | House | Read First Time (H) |
2020-12-01 | House | Prefiled (H) |